Former Senator Nathaniel T. Oaks

District 41


Senator Nathaniel T. Oaks
Annapolis Address:

Phone: Toll-free in MD: 1-800-492-7122 ext. 5400
Interim Address:
Contact:Contact Online or send email to: @senate.state.md.us
Tenure:First elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 1982. Member of the House of Delegates 1983-1989. Next elected to the House of Delegates, 1994. Member of the House of Delegates, 1995-2017. Resigned, February 10, 2017. Member of the Maryland Senate since February 10, 2017. Resigned March 29, 2018
Current Assignments:
Party Affiliation:Democrat

April 18, 2018 4:15 P.M.
Senator Nathaniel T. Oaks
TenureFirst elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 1982. Member of the House of Delegates 1983-1989. Next elected to the House of Delegates, 1994. Member of the House of Delegates, 1995-2017. Resigned, February 10, 2017. Member of the Maryland Senate since February 10, 2017. Resigned March 29, 2018
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
2017-2018
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive and Legislative Review
2017-2018
Finance Committee
Past House Service
2003-2017
Health and Government Operations Committee
2015-2017
Public Health & Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2005-2017
Government Operations Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2015-2016
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup
2003-2017
Joint Audit Committee
2015-2017
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review (AELR) (1995-2003)
2003-2015
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
2005
Minority Health Disparities Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2004
Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2005-2014
Public Health & Long Term Care Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2003-2004
Health Facilities, Equipment, and Product Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2003-2004
Health Insurance Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
2003-2004
Long Term Care Subcommittee of the Health and Government Operations Committee
1995-2003
Environmental Matters Committee
1999-2003
Health Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
1999-2003
Public Utilities Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
1995
Transportation and Motor Vehicle Subcommittee of the Commerce and Government Matters Committee
Public Service
2017-2018, 2000-2017
Lead Poisoning Prevention Commission
2017-2018
Pimlico Community Development Authority
2009
Task Force on the Minority Business Enterprise Program and Equity Investment Capital
1995-2018
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland (Health Committee 2007-17), (Health Care Committee( 2000-07). ( International Affairs Committee 2001-17)
1995-2018
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland (Economic Development (Committee 2000- )
2001-2018
National Conference of State Legislatures (Health Committee)
2006-2007
Co-Chair, Task Force on Minority Participation in the Environmental Community
1996-2002
Governor's Task Force on African-American Entrepreneurship in Baltimore City
2000
Delegate, Democratic Party National Convention
1997-1999
Advisory Council on Environmental Justice
1983-1986
Governor's High Technology Roundtable
1975-1983
Board of Liquor License Commissioners, Baltimore City
1976
Presidential Elector, Maryland
1971
Baltimore City Fair Steering Committee
Memberships
2003-2018
Maryland Bicycle and Pedestrian Caucus
1998-
Baltimore City Democratic Central Committee
1977-1978
Executive Board, Democratic State Central Committee
New Democratic Coalition, 5th District
Board Member, Urban Scientist, Inc.
Secretary, Northwest Civic Forum
Financial Secretary, Five-in-Five Democratic Club, Inc.
Board of Governors, Citizens Planning and Housing Association
Steering Committee, Edmonson-Frederick Community Coalition
Concerned Citizens of Edmonson Village
Edmonson Village League
Northwest Outer Urban Coalition
Baltimore Life Underwriters' Association
Baltimore Chapter, National Association of Black Social Workers
National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (NAACP)
Biographical Information
Born, Baltimore, Maryland, October 19, 1946.
Edmonson High School, Baltimore, MD
University of Baltimore
Towson State College
Morgan State College, B.S., Business, 1974
Insurance Agent
Notary Public
Single

May 7, 2018 8:11 A.M.