Former Delegate Jeffrey A. Paige

District 44


Delegate Jeffrey A. Paige
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 13, 1999 to January 10, 2007, representing District 44, Baltimore City
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2003-2007
Appropriations Committee
1999-2003
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, March 9, 1956
Baltimore City Community College, A.A. Business 1977
Two children
Died in Baltimore, Maryland, January 7, 2014

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.