Former Delegate Joanne S. Parrott

District 35A


Delegate Joanne S. Parrott
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 13, 1999 to January 10, 2007, representing District 35A, Harford County
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
2003-2007
Economic Matters Committee
1999-2003
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Ephrata, Pennsylvania, September 11, 1940
Gettysburg College
Peabody Conservatory of Music
Widow, four children
Died in Fallston, Maryland, March 4, 2009

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.