Former Delegate Emil B. Pielke

District 9B


Delegate Emil B. Pielke
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 14, 2002 to January 8, 2003, representing District 9B, Baltimore County
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
2002-2003
Economic Matters Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, March 4, 1942
Capital University, B.A. History 1964
University of Maryland School of Law, J.D. 1971
Admitted to Maryland Bar 1972
Served in U.S. Air Force 1964-1968 and Maryland Air National Guard
Married, one child
Died in Towson, Maryland, June 6, 2008

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.