Former Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr.

District 27A


Delegate James E. Proctor, Jr.
TenureFirst elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 1990. Member of the House since 1990: appointed April 30 and sworn in May 2, 1990. Died in office, September 10, 2015. Elizabeth "Susie" Proctor appointed October 9, 2015. Sworn in October 30, 2015
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2007-2015
Vice Chair, Appropriations Committee
2015
Vice-Chair, Capital Budget Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee (Member 1995)
2011-2015
Health and Human Resources Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee
2011-2015, 1995-2006
Oversight Committee on Pensions of the Appropriations Committee
2011-2014
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee
1995-2011
Capital Budget Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee
2011-2014, 1995-2006
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee
2011-2014
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee
2007-2014
Oversight Committee on Personnel of the Appropriations Committee
2014-2015
House Chair, Spending Affordability Committee (Member, 2013)
2007-2010
Spending Affordability Committee
2005-2006
Juvenile Services Workgroup of the Appropriations Committee
2002-2006
Chair, Education and Economic Development Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee
2007-2015
House Committee on Rules and Executive Nominations
2003-2004
Special Committee on Higher Education Affordability and Accessibility
1993-2003
Joint Committee on Health Care Delivery and Financing
1995-2002
House Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions
1995-2002
Vice Chair, Education and Economic Development Subcommittee of the Appropriations Committee
1995-2002
Chair, Oversight Committee on Pensions of the Appropriations Committee
1993-1999
Oversight Committee on Program Open Space and Agricultural Preservation of the Appropriations Committee
1990-1992
Environmental Matters Committee
Public Service
2009-2015
State Advisory Board for Juvenile Services
2003-2008
Board of Directors, Maryland School for the Blind
2005-2015
Cheltenham Youth Facility Advisory Board
2004
State Planning Committee for Higher Education
2004
University System of Maryland Financial Aid Task Force
2001-2015
Chair, Historically Black Colleges and Universities Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland
2000-2015
Judicial Nominating Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland
2000-2015
Protocol Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland
2000
Budget Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland
2000
Nominating Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland
1997-1998
Task Force on Education Funding Equity, Accountability, and Partnerships
1994-1996
U.S. 301 South Corridor Transportation Study Task Force
1994-2015
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland
1982-1985
Vice Chair and Member, Landlord-Tenant Commission, Prince George's County
Past Vice Chair, Prince George's County Delegation
Member and Past Chair, County Affairs Committee, Prince George's County Delegation
1990-2015
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
Memberships
2006-2015
Maryland Veterans Caucus
2002-2015
Maryland Rural Caucus
2001-2015
Maryland Legislative Sportsmen's Caucus
1980-1982
Governing Body, Southern Maryland Health Systems Agency, Prince George's County
President, Cedarville Citizens Association (12 years)
National Education Association
Maryland State Teachers Association
Prince George's Educators Association
Association of School-Based Administrators and Supervisors
Awards
2010
Charles McC. Mathias, Jr., Award, House of Delegates
Biographical Information
Born, Washington, DC, June 14, 1936
Dunbar High School, Washington, DC, 1954
Bowie State University, B.S., Elementary Education, 1969
Bowie State University, M.A. Administration Supervision, 1973
Served in U.S. Air Force, 1961-62, 1968
Virology Research Technician, National Institutes of Health (10 years)
Principal, Prince George's County School System (17 years)
Retired Educator: Former Teacher, Principal, and College Instructor
Full-time Legislator
Member, St. Mary's of Piscataway Catholic Church
Married, Two children, Three grandchildren
Died, Washington, D.C., September 10, 2015

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.