Former Senator Jamie Raskin

District 20


Senator Jamie Raskin
TenureFirst elected to the Maryland Senate in 2006. Member of the Senate since 2007. Elected to the U.S. House of Representatives, District 8, on November 8, 2016. Resigned from the Maryland Senate effective November 10, 2016.
Party Affiliation
Past Senate Service
2012-2016
Majority Whip
2015-2016
Chair, Executive Nominations Committee
2007-2016
Judicial Proceedings Committee
2007-2016
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics (Senate Chair, 2015-16)
2007-2016
Joint Committee on the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area
2007-2016
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
2012-2014
Chair, Senate Special Committee on Ethics Reform
2012
Task Force to Study Court Decision Regarding Pit Bulls
2011-2015
Chair, Senate Select Committee No. 6, Montgomery County
2015-2016
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup
Public Service
2011-2012
Maryland Medical Marijuana Model Program Work Group
2010-2011
Attorney General's Advisory Committee on Campaign Finance
2008-2011
Vice Chair, Montgomery County Delegation
2007-2010
Co-Chair, Maryland Clean Car and Energy Policy Task Force
2008-2016
Education Committee, Southern Legislative Conference
2008
Maryland Commission on Capital Punishment
2004-2008
Delegate, Democratic Party National Convention
2007-2016
State Advisory Council on Administrative Hearings
2007-2012
Commission on Civic Literacy
2007-2016
State Coordinator, Legislators' Back-to-School Program, National Conference of State Legislatures
2001-2005
Chair, State Higher Education Labor Relations Board
1990
Redistricting Task Force, City of Takoma Park
Former Member, Hate Crimes Commission, Montgomery County
Former Member, Gun Policy Task Force, City of Takoma Park
Memberships
2006
Board of Directors, FairVote, The Center for Voting and Democracy
Massachusetts Bar Association
District of Columbia Bar Association
Maryland Bar Association
Awards
2012
Legislator of the Year Award, Maryland Access to Justice Commission
2000-2002
Young Leader, French-American Foundation
2000-2001
Scholar-Teacher of the Year, American University
Biographical Information
Born, Washington, DC, December 13, 1962
Georgetown Day High School, 1979
Harvard College, B.A., Government, magna cum laude, 1983
Harvard Law School, J.D., magna cum laude, 1987 (Editor, Harvard Law Review)
Benjamin A. Trustman Travelling Fellowship, 1983-84
Teaching Fellow, Harvard University Government Department, 1985-1987
Assistant Attorney General, Commonwealth of Massachusetts, 1987-1989
General Counsel, National Rainbow Coalition, 1989-1990
Professor of Law, The Washington College of Law, American University, 1990-2017
Associate Dean, Faculty and Academic Affairs, The Washington College of Law, American University, 1994-96
Founder and Director, Marshall-Brennan Fellowship Program, American University, 1999-
Visiting Professor, Institut D'Etudes Sciences Politique, Paris, France, 2003-04
Taught International Trade and Human Rights in Argentina and Chile, Summer 2005
Lecturer throughout France for the U.S. Embassy
Author
Elected to the U.S. House of Representatives, November 8, 2016, representing District 8
Member of the U.S. House of Representatives since January 3, 2017
Married; three children

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.