Former Delegate B. Daniel Riley

District 34A


Delegate B. Daniel Riley
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 13, 1999 to January 8, 2003, representing District 34A, Harford County, and January 10, 2007 to January 12, 2011, representing District 34A, Cecil and Harford Counties. Deceased, August 31, 2016, Edgewood, Maryland.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2007-2011
Health and Government Operations Committee
1999-2003
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
2008-2011
Joint Committee on Base Realignment and Closure
Biographical Information
Born in London, England, February 16, 1946
Towson State University, B.S. Education 1978, M.A. Education 1984
Married, one child

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.