Former Delegate Tod D. Sher

District 14A


Delegate Tod D. Sher
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 13, 1999 to January 8, 2003, representing District 14A, Montgomery County. Died, March 16, 2015, Silver Spring, Maryland.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1999-2003
Environmental Matters Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Takoma Park, Maryland, November 19, 1962
Duke University, B.S. Computer Science 1984
University of Maryland, M.S. Systems Management 1994
Died, March 16, 2015, Silver Spring, Maryland

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.