Former Delegate Louise V. Snodgrass

District 3


Delegate Louise V. Snodgrass
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 11, 1995 to January 8, 2003, representing District 3, Frederick and Washington Counties
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
1995-2003
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1999-2003
Joint Committee on Protocol
1995-1997
Joint Committee to Study Mandates on Local Government
2000-2003
Chair, Frederick County Delegation
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, June 28, 1942
Frederick Community College, Pre-Hygiene Program
University of Maryland Dental School, Certification as Dental Assistant
Married, two children
Died in Dover, Delaware, June 11, 2009

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.