Delegate Donna Stifler

2013 Regular Session

District 35A, Harford County

Total Bills: 17 (Primary Sponsor: 2, Co-sponsor: 14, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0091Income Tax Checkoff for Wounded Warrior ProgramsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0935 / CH0654Public Institutions of Higher Education - In-State Tuition for Military VeteransApproved by the Governor - Chapter 654Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0137Election Law - Polling Places - Proof of IdentityIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Co-SponsorTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0231
    (SB0223 / CH0207)
Alcoholic Beverages - Class 7 Limited Beer Wholesaler's LicenseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0408 / CH0258
    (SB0404 / CH0257)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Enhanced Agricultural Management EquipmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0505Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security NumberIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0544
    (SB0491)
Criminal Procedure - Supervising Authority - Sex Offender Transfer NotificationsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0618Civil Actions - Liability for Personal Injury or Death Caused by DogIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0663Public Safety - Firearms - National Crime Information Center ParticipationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0819Prudent Pension Management ActIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0877 / CH0555
    (SB0811 / CH0554)
Procurement - Investment Activities in Iran - Board of Public Works Authority to Adopt RegulationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 555Health and Government Operations
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0969Commission to Consider Mental Health-Related Ways to Limit Mass Violence by Individuals with Antisocial Personality Disorders, Depressive Disorders, or Other Mental IllnessIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1152Electric Reliability - Priorities and FundingIn the Senate - Favorable Report by FinanceEconomic Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1247State Government - Frederick Douglass and Harriet Tubman Memorial Statues - Placement and CommissionIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - AdministrationBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:50 A.M.