Delegate Donna Stifler

2014 Regular Session

District 35A, Harford County

Total Bills: 17 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 17, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0050
    (SB0464)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0148Education - Public School Holidays - Veterans' DayIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0168 / CH0588Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - Boards, Commissions, and Councils - Member RemovalApproved by the Governor - Chapter 588Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0208 / CH0518
    (SB0546 / CH0517)
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and LabelsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0261
    (SB0161 / CH0278)
Alcoholic Beverages - Hard Cider - DefinitionVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0283
    (SB0034)
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0353
    (SB0143)
Income Tax - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0358
    (SB0270)
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking OffensesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0477
    (SB0173)
Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - ExceptionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0521Firearms - Handgun Permit Requirements - Handgun Qualification License HoldersIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0575
    (SB0221 / CH0146)
Farm Area Motor Vehicles - Registration and Authorized UseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0715
    (SB0584)
Public Safety - Handgun Identification Requirements - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0774
    (SB0445)
Alcoholic Beverages - Micro-Breweries - Annual Production LimitIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1159 / CH0447Cigarettes - County Retail License Holder - Prohibited SalesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1246 / CH0450
    (SB0771)
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - EstablishmentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 450Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB1361Joint Committee to Review the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and Audit by the Office of Legislative AuditsIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 12:30 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/7/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
HJ0009
    (SJ0009)
General Assembly Compensation Commission - RecommendationsIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.