Former Delegate Cathy Vitale

District 33


Total Bills: 40 (Primary Sponsor: 8, Co-sponsor: 24, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0033Housing and Community Development - Community Development Projects and Public Purpose ProjectsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0064 / CH0220Alcoholic Beverages - Local Licensing Boards - Judicial ReviewApproved by the Governor - Chapter 220Economic Matters
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0065
    (SB0224)
Education - Maintenance of Effort - Lease Payment ExclusionIn the House - Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m.Ways and Means
2/5/2015 - 2:15 p.m.
PrimaryPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0160Handgun Locking Devices - Repeal Exclusivity of Internal Locks - Requirements for External or Internal Lock SystemIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0162
    (SB0611)
State Government - Maryland Uniform Electronic Legal Materials ActIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0736
    (SB0155)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Belvoir-Scott's Plantation Historic Manor HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1070General Assembly - Filling of VacancyIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansPrimaryState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB1107
    (SB0771)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Broadneck High School Field HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0149State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap ReductionIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0170
    (SB0088 / CH0148)
Natural Resources - Game Birds - BaitingVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0174Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0299
    (SB0291)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Crownsville Treatment CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0306Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0406Education - Implementation of the Common Core State Standards - ProhibitionIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0454
    (SB0664)
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - ProhibitionIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0464
    (SB0454)
Handgun Permits - ReciprocityIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0492Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0727Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Wireless Telecommunications Towers - Moratorium and ReportIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0734
    (SB0406)
Anne Arundel County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0743Handgun Permits - Firearms Training Course - Renewal ApplicationIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0767
    (SB0100)
Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - QualificationsIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0782 / CH0455
    (SB0408)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB0871 / CH0462State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Expiration and Surrender of Registrations and Civil and Criminal PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 462Economic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0874
    (SB0042)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
HB0917 / CH0287
    (SB0716)
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting MotorcyclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0958
    (SB0447)
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting GoodsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0960Retire in Maryland Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1005Natural Resources - Commercial Fisheries Offenses - Stay of RevocationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1008Recreational Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Voter RegistrationIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB1024Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - FingerprintingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HJ0005
    (SJ0005)
Natural Resources - Goose and Duck Hunting Seasons - ExtensionIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0481
    (SB0588)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0482
    (SB0592 / CH0125)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0484
    (SB0591)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0368 / CH0360
    (SB0214)
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Emergency Medical Care for Drug OverdoseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 15, 2015 12:15 P.M.