Delegate Pat Young

2015 Regular Session

District 44B, Baltimore County

Total Bills: 33 (Primary Sponsor: 2, Co-sponsor: 31, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0799 / CH0279Higher Education - Veterans and Dependents Nonresident Tuition - Compliance With Federal LawApproved by the Governor - Chapter 279Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryHigher Education (F2)
HB1281Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Maryland Search and Rescue Wilderness EMSIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0130
    (SB0601 / CH0371)
African American Heritage Preservation Program - Reestablishment and RevisionsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCapital Budget (B5)
HB0196
    (SB0072)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card ApplicantsIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0197 / CH0406
    (SB0295)
Prince George's County - Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 406Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0198
    (SB0294)
Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot ProgramIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansCo-SponsorEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0227Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of AbuseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0236 / CH0410
    (SB0705)
Criminal Law - Assault - First RespondersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Judiciary
2/20/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0243 / CH0344
    (SB0350 / CH0343)
Procurement - Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Participation GoalApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0298 / CH0413Education - Student Data Privacy Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 413Ways and Means
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0340 / CH0241
    (SB0889)
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall DayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Health and Government Operations
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0371Gaming - Video Lottery Operation License - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall AirportIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorGaming (C7)
HB0373Real Property - Candidates and Campaign Volunteers - Access to Private Residential AreasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB0382 / CH0244Sexual Assault Survivors' Right to Know ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 244Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0439
    (SB0685 / CH0046)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0498
    (SB0392)
Criminal Law - Assault - First RespondersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0533 / CH0129
    (SB0628)
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control DeviceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0643
    (SB0567 / CH0366)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorChildren (O4)
HB0673Community Colleges - Tuition Waiver for Full-Time Students - Full State ReimbursementIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0730Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0754Sexual Assault - Survivors' Right to Know - DNA Analysis of Kit EvidenceIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0760
    (SB0557)
Food Fish and Shellfish - Labeling and Identification Requirements (Maryland Seafood Authenticity Act)In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0834Junior Advancement via Association Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0846 / CH0283
    (SB0671)
Motor Vehicle Administration - Commercial Driver's License - Program for Veterans and Service Members (Troops to Trucks)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0872Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:15 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2015 - 1:15 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0965 / CH0291
    (SB0334)
The Hunger-Free Schools Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1024Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - FingerprintingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1031Governor's Office for Children - Let's Play Maryland Pilot ProgramIn the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansCo-SponsorChildren (O4)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorDisabled (O3)
HB1249Task Force to Improve Suicide Prevention Programs for VeteransIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HJ0008
    (SJ0003)
Honoring the Surviving Human Trafficking Victims of Asia and the Pacific Islands During World War IIIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 3:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.