Former Delegate Craig J. Zucker

District 14


Total Bills: 25 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 25, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0027Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0073
    (SB0210)
Intercounty Connector - Public School Bus - Exemption From TollIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0085 / CH0250Education - Children With Disabilities - Support Services - Parental NotificationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0086 / CH0205
    (SB0421 / CH0204)
Special Education - Translations of Individualized Education Programs or Individualized Family Service Plans - Native LanguageApproved by the Governor - Chapter 205Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0141
    (SB0407)
Education - Assessments - Limits on TestingIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0211 / CH0662
    (SB0198 / CH0661)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorAgriculture (M4)
HB0228
    (SB0409)
Maryland Aviation Administration - Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Management of Food Service and Retail ConcessionsIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/12/2016 - 12:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0330
    (SB0515)
County Boards of Education - Procurements for Construction or Repair of School ProjectsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0345Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic BeveragesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0349 / CH0717
    (SB1162)
Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0365 / CH0262Public Schools - Bullying, Harassment, and Intimidation Policies - UpdateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0368 / CH0015
    (SB0370 / CH0014)
Board of Public Works Transparency Act of 2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorOperating Budget (B1)
HB0371
    (SB0819)
Independent Living Tax Credit ActIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0377
    (SB0513)
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury FundIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations and Judiciary)Health and Government Operations
2/12/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0404
    (SB0418)
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option ActIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB0409 / CH0513
    (SB0564)
Criminal Law - Providing Alcohol to Underage Drinkers - Penalties (Alex and Calvin's Law)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0412 / CH0264
    (SB0533)
Education - Assessments - Administration and Provision of InformationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0420 / CH0522
    (SB0417 / CH0521)
Individuals With Disabilities - Minimum Wage and Community Integration (Ken Capone Equal Employment Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522Economic Matters
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0426Vehicle Laws - Bicycles and Motor Scooters - Use of Bike LanesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0430Education - Student Data Privacy CouncilIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0493 / CH0537
    (SB0178 / CH0536)
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration StatusApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0518
    (SB0259)
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - ImpositionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0551 / CH0271Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program MediationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0595
    (SB0497)
Behavioral Health Community Providers - Keep the Door Open ActIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesCo-SponsorPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 23, 2016 9:45 A.M.