HB1240 (CH0149)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Continuing Care Retirement Community License Ho. Co. 10-13

Sponsored by:

Howard County Delegation

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149


Synopsis:Establishing in Howard County a Class C (Continuing Care Retirement Community) beer, wine and liquor license; establishing qualifications for a licensee; authorizing a licensee to keep for sale and sell at retail to a resident or a guest of the community beer, wine, and liquor for consumption on the premises; and providing for a $250 annual license fee.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Howard County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  Listen to Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Howard County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(6-301)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
3/7/20133/7/2013Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/8/20133/8/2013Favorable Report Adopted43
Second Reading Passed43
3/12/20133/12/2013Third Reading Passed (136-0)45
Senate3/13/20133/13/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs44
3/15/20133/15/2013Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20134/1/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20133/27/2013Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/3/20133/29/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)60
House4/3/20133/28/2013Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/9/20134/9/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.