SB0384

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Economic Development - Sickle Cell Disease Research Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing the Sickle Cell Disease Research Program to be administered by the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide grants for sickle cell disease research projects; establishing the purposes of the Program; establishing specified types of grants to be awarded under the Program; establishing the Sickle Cell Disease Research Fund in the Corporation; providing for the purpose and composition of the Fund; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Pugh, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Dyson, Forehand, Garagiola, Getty, Glassman, Jacobs, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, King, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Montgomery, Muse, Peters, Raskin, Robey, and Stone
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0726
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1026 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Finance  Listen to Committee HearingHealth and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Economic and Community Development
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Grants
Industry and Technology
Loans -see also- Mortgages
Medical Research
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Economic Development
(10-463 through 10-468)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20131/25/2013First Reading Finance
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2/21/20132/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2/22/20132/22/2013Favorable with Amendments {847876/131
Laid Over (Senator Madaleno) Adopted31
2/25/20132/25/2013Favorable with Amendments {847876/1 Report Adopted32
Second Reading Passed with Amendments32
2/27/20132/27/2013Third Reading Passed (47-0)34
House2/28/20132/28/2013First Reading Health and Government Operations37
3/13/20133/13/2013Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:08 P.M.