SB0399

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Care Malpractice Claims - Use of Clinical Practice Guidelines

Sponsored by:

Senator Pugh

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring a claim for damages due to medical injury to be referred to the Director of the Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office to select an independent medical review panel if a defendant asserts as a defense that specified clinical practice guidelines apply and the defendant acted in accordance with the guidelines; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations establishing clinical practice guidelines for obstetrical and gynecological services; etc.
Analysis:Not available at this time
All Sponsors:Senators Pugh and Muse
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Alternative Dispute Resolution -see also- Arbitra; Mediation
Claims
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Malpractice
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Review Boards
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Women
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(3-2A-03A, 3-2A-03B)
Article - Health - General
(2-701, 2-702)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/6/20152/6/2015First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/10/20152/10/2015Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2/24/20152/24/2015Hearing cancelled
2/27/20152/27/2015Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:48 P.M.