HB1398

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Homeowner's Insurance - Discrimination Based on Driving History of Applicant or Insured

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jameson

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to homeowner's insurance, from refusing to underwrite, canceling, or refusing to renew a risk, rating a risk, or requiring a particular payment plan based, in whole or in part, on the driving history of an applicant or insured; and applying the Act to all policies of homeowner's insurance issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on and after October 1, 2016.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Jameson
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Other than Health
Narrow Subject(s):Discrimination
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condos; Mobile & Manuf Homes
Insurance -see also- Health Ins; MAIF; Motor Vehicle Ins
Motor Vehicle Operation
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Statutes:Article - Insurance
(27-501)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20163/14/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
3/15/20163/12/2016Favorable Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed44
3/16/20163/13/2016Third Reading Passed (107-32)45
Senate3/17/20163/17/2016First Reading Finance46
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.