SB0178 (CH0536)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status

Sponsored by:

Senator Lee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from committing a specified act of extortion by wrongful use of actual or threatened notification of law enforcement officials about another person's undocumented or illegal immigration status.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Lee, Benson, King, Manno, Nathan-Pulliam, Ramirez, and Raskin
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0493
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Disclosure
Extortion
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Nonresidents
Nonresidents -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-701)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/18/20161/18/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/22/20161/22/2016Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2/29/20162/29/2016Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/1/20163/1/2016Favorable Report Adopted34
Second Reading Passed34
3/3/20163/3/2016Third Reading Passed (46-0)36
House3/4/20163/4/2016First Reading Judiciary38
3/18/20163/18/2016Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20164/7/2016Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/7/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/8/20164/2/2016Third Reading Passed (127-10)65
Senate4/9/20164/3/2016Returned Passed63
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:08 P.M.