SB1009 (CH0707)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Liquidated Damages

Sponsored by:

Senator Benson

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707


Synopsis:Making a contractor under a public work contract that knew or reasonably should have known of the contractor's obligation to pay the prevailing wage rate and that deliberately failed or refused to pay to the prevailing wage rate liable to the public body for liquidated damages of $250 for each laborer or other employee under specified circumstances.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Benson, Manno, Kelley, Middleton, and Pugh
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0689
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEconomic Matters
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Procurement
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Contractors -see also- Heating & Cooling; Home Improvement
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Damages
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Procurement
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - State Finance and Procurement
(17-222)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/15/20162/15/2016First Reading Senate Rules
2/25/20162/25/2016Rereferred to Finance
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
4/1/20164/1/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/1/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments {567879/157
Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted57
4/4/20163/29/2016Favorable with Amendments {567879/1 Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed with Amendments58
4/5/20163/30/2016Third Reading Passed (32-14)59
House4/5/20163/29/2016First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations61
4/6/20164/6/2016Rereferred to Economic Matters
4/8/20164/8/2016Favorable Report by Economic Matters
4/8/20164/2/2016Favorable Report Adopted65
Second Reading Passed65
4/11/20164/5/2016Third Reading Passed (95-46)68
Senate4/11/20164/5/2016Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/28/20165/28/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:11 P.M.