HB0059

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Assault Weapons - Replacements

Sponsored by:

Delegate Howard, S.

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing a person to replace a lost or broken assault weapon that was lawfully possessed in accordance with specified provisions of law if the replacement is registered with the Secretary of State Police.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate S. Howard
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0317 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Guns
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(4-303)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2017 3:17 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House10/19/201610/19/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Judiciary
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 8, 2017 5:10 P.M.