HB1036

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rey

Status:

In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)


Synopsis:Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval for a handgun permit if the applicant meets specified requirements except the required certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy a specified firearm training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Rey, Bromwell, Buckel, Carey, Clark, Cluster, Fisher, Glass, S. Howard, Malone, McConkey, Morgan, Parrott, Queen, Saab, Simonaire, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Guns
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Notices
State Police, Department of
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(5-301, 5-306)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 11:42 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20172/8/2017First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable Report Adopted48
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 48
3/20/20173/16/2017Second Reading Passed50
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (97-41)51
Senate3/21/20173/19/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings48
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted (24-23)63A
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Hough) (30-16)63A
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/10/20174/4/2017Favorable Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed64
Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted64
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted64
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 12:05 A.M.