SB0224

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime

Sponsored by:

Senator Lee

Status:

In the Senate - Returned Passed


Synopsis:Altering a specified definition of "convicted of a disqualifying crime" to include a case in which a person received probation before judgment for assault in the second degree, if the crime was a specified domestically related crime.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Lee, Kelley, Muse, Ramirez, Brochin, and Smith
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Guns
Parole and Probation
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(5-101)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 30, 2017 4:37 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/19/20171/19/2017First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/8/20172/8/2017Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Favorable with Amendments {968671/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/20/20173/18/2017Third Reading Passed (26-21)47
House3/21/20173/18/2017First Reading Judiciary52
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Judiciary
4/10/20174/5/2017Favorable Report Adopted70
Second Reading Passed70
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19)70
Third Reading Passed (98-34)70
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 11, 2017 2:35 P.M.