SB0268 (CH0399)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species; requiring the Department to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species on or before December 31, 2018, subject to available funding; prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a specified cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until July 1, 2019.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Young, Benson, Guzzone, and Pinsky
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0211
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Hunting and Fishing
Narrow Subject(s):Contests
Emergency Bills
Emergencies
Fish and Fishing -see also- Aquaculture; Gill Nets
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Natural Resources
(4-215)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/20/20171/20/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20172/7/2017Favorable18
Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted 18
Favorable18
Special Order until 2/8 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 18
2/8/20172/8/2017Favorable Report Adopted19
Floor Amendment {103824/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted19
Second Reading Passed with Amendments19
2/13/20172/13/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/14/20172/14/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation25
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20174/6/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
4/6/20173/30/2017Favorable with Amendments {990715/1 Report Adopted64
Second Reading Passed with Amendments64
4/8/20174/1/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-23)66
Senate4/10/20174/3/2017Senate Concur - House Amendments63A
Third Reading Passed (47-0)63A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:10 P.M.