HB0204 (CH0290)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Yellow Signal Compliance

Sponsored by:

Delegate Korman

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290


Synopsis:Prohibiting certain law enforcement agencies from issuing a citation for a violation recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system at a traffic control signal that does not comply with certain yellow light timing requirements set in accordance with regulations adopted by the State Highway Administration consistent with standards or guidelines established by the Federal Highway Administration.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Korman, Anderton, Carr, Flanagan, Folden, Jalisi, Knotts, McCray, McMillan, and Wivell
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Narrow Subject(s):Citations
Equipment -see also- Motor Vehicle Equipment
Highways
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(21-202.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 1:12 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/18/20181/18/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
1/22/20181/22/2018Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {430117/1 Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed with Amendments35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)37
Senate3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings38
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20183/28/2018Returned Passed62
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.