HB0591 (CH0442)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Dispensing of Drugs Under a Delegation Agreement

Sponsored by:

Delegate Platt

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442


Synopsis:Altering the required contents of a certain delegation agreement in order for a primary supervising physician to delegate to a certain physician assistant the dispensing of certain substances, drugs, and devices; prohibiting a primary supervising physician from delegating the dispensing of controlled dangerous substances identified as Schedule I; authorizing a physician assistant, under certain circumstances, to personally prepare and dispense a drug that the assistant is authorized to prescribe; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Platt
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Controlled Dangerous Substances -see also- Drugs; Subst Abus
Drugs -see also- Controlled Dangerous Sub; Substance Abuse
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Identification
Physician Assistants
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(15-101, 15-302.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:18 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House1/29/20181/29/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2/28/20182/28/2018Favorable with Amendments {416980/1 Report Adopted36
Second Reading Passed with Amendments36
3/2/20183/2/2018Third Reading Passed (136-1)38
Senate3/5/20183/5/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs39
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted58
Second Reading Passed58
4/2/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)59
House4/3/20183/25/2018Returned Passed59
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.