HB0862

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transportation - Ignition Interlock Devices - Definition

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kramer

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings


Synopsis:Altering the definition of "ignition interlock system" to require that an ignition interlock device be equipped with a camera capable of recording the image of the driver of the motor vehicle in which the device is installed.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Kramer and Barkley
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: HB0784 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving
Narrow Subject(s):Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Photography
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(21-902.2)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2018 4:47 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Judiciary
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2/26/20182/26/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
2/27/20182/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted35
Second Reading Passed35
3/1/20183/1/2018Third Reading Passed (134-3)37
Senate3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings38
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 4:40 P.M.