HB0905 (CH0231)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Reissuance of Licenses (Community Liquor Empowerment Act of 2018)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Ali

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231


Synopsis:Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to reissue a Class B-D-7 license as a 7-day beer, wine, and liquor (package goods) license if the licensed premises is within the 41st legislative district and is equipped with high-definition cameras that provide continuous, 24-hour monitoring inside and outside the licensed premises; specifying the hours of sale for a 7-day beer, wine, and liquor license authorized under the Act; and providing certain penalties for a certain violation.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Ali, Anderson, Conaway, Gibson, Glenn, Hayes, Haynes, Mosby, and Rosenberg
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Baltimore City
Boundaries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Time
Statutes:Article - Alcoholic Beverages
(12-102, 12-905)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 12:59 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Economic Matters
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30/20183/30/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/30/20183/23/2018Favorable with Amendments {573891/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/3/20183/25/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)59
Senate4/4/20183/30/2018First Reading Senate Rules61
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed (44-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.