HB0944

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

First Responders - Mandatory Autism Training

Sponsored by:

Delegate Shoemaker

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary


Synopsis:Requiring each first responder in the State to complete autism awareness training approved by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Shoemaker and Rose
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Disabled
Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Developmental Disabilities -see also- Vulnerable Adults
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Police Training Commission
Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(7-404)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 21, 2018 2:32 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Judiciary

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 1, 2018 10:01 A.M.