HB1008

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Board of Physicians - Invasive Cardiovascular Professionals

Sponsored by:

Delegate Cullison

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Authorizing certain registered cardiovascular invasive specialists to perform certain functions; requiring a registered cardiovascular invasive specialist to be supervised by a licensed physician; establishing that the failure of certain licensed physicians to provide proper supervision constitutes professional misconduct; requiring the State Board of Physicians to keep a list of all cardiovascular invasive specialists and adopt certain regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Cullison
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1087
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1025 Session: 2005 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Health Occupations
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Laboratories
Patients
Physicians -see also- Dentists; Med Exmnrs; Psych; etc
Registration -see also- Motor Vehicle Registration
Rules and Regulations
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Statutes:Article - Health Occupations
(14-5G-01 through 14-5G-05)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 8, 2018 10:19 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2/22/20182/22/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23/20182/23/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/20/20183/20/2018Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 19, 2018 4:04 P.M.