SB0178

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – Oath

Sponsored by:

Senator Guzzone

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)


Synopsis:Altering from 10 to 30 days after the appointment or election of an individual to the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System during which the individual is required to take the oath of office; clarifying that individuals appointed or elected to the Board of Trustees take a certain oath required by Article I, § 9 of the Maryland Constitution; requiring the oath to be taken before a clerk or deputy clerk of a circuit court; providing the State Treasurer will be chairman of the Board of Trustees; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senator Guzzone (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1020
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Pensions and Retirement
Narrow Subject(s):Circuit Courts
Clerks of Court
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Oaths
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Time
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(21-104, 21-105)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/17/20181/17/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
Hearing 1/25 at 9:30 a.m.
1/29/20181/29/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
1/30/20181/30/2018Favorable Report Adopted15
Second Reading Passed15
2/1/20182/1/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)17
House2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Appropriations18
2/28/20182/28/2018Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20184/9/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
4/9/20184/1/2018Favorable with Amendments {734866/1 Report Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)67
Senate4/9/20184/4/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments66
Third Reading Passed (46-0)66
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20185/25/2018Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.