SB0332 (CH0416)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Prince George's County - School Construction Master Plan Workgroup

Sponsored by:

Senator Rosapepe

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416


Synopsis:Establishing the Prince George's County School Construction Master Plan Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to make recommendations based on its review of the FY2017 Educational Facilities Master Plan; requiring the Workgroup to report its findings by December 31, 2018, to the Prince George's County Executive, the Prince George's County Council, the Prince George's County Board of Education, the Interagency Committee on School Construction, and the Prince George's County House and Senate Delegations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1438
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingAppropriations
Broad Subject(s):Education - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Construction
Education, Boards of
Prince George's County
Public Schools
Reports
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:15 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/20181/26/2018Reassigned to Budget and Taxation13
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)58
House4/2/20183/24/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations58
4/6/20184/6/2018Rereferred to Appropriations
4/9/20184/9/2018Hearing 4/09 at 3:45 p.m.
Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/9/20184/3/2018Favorable Report Adopted68
Second Reading Passed68
4/9/20184/4/2018Third Reading Passed (132-0)69
Senate12/8/20174/5/2018Returned Passed67
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 416

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.