SB0368

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Labor and Employment - State Minimum Wage Rate - Increase

Sponsored by:

Senator McFadden

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Specifying the State minimum wage rate in effect for certain time periods based on employer size; increasing the State minimum wage rate based on the annual growth in the Consumer Price Index for All Urban Consumers for the Washington-Baltimore metropolitan area, or a certain successor index; requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, beginning at a certain time, to annually determine and announce the growth in the Consumer Price Index and the new State minimum wage rate; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators McFadden, Conway, Currie, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Robinson, and Rosapepe
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Private Sector Labor and Industry
Narrow Subject(s):Consumer Price Index
Labor and Industry, Division of
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Small Business
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(3-413)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 2:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/24/20181/24/2018First Reading Finance
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20182/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 6, 2018 1:45 P.M.