SB0402 (CH0737)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Family Life and Human Sexuality Curriculum - Boundaries and Consent

Sponsored by:

Senator Zucker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737


Synopsis:Requiring a county board of education to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent," which is defined as the unambiguous and voluntary agreement between all participants in each physical act within the course of interpersonal relationships, including respect for personal boundaries; and requiring a county board to provide age-appropriate instruction on the meaning of "consent" as part of the Family Life and Human Sexuality curriculum beginning in the 2018-1019 school year.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Zucker, Conway, Waugh, Kagan, Nathan-Pulliam, Pinsky, Robinson, Salling, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0251
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Public Schools
Sexual Offenses
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-441)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:37 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20181/25/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/20182/20/2018Favorable with Amendments {604835/1 Report Adopted30
Second Reading Passed with Amendments30
2/22/20182/22/2018Third Reading Passed (45-0)32
House2/23/20182/23/2018First Reading Ways and Means33
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
3/26/20183/26/2018Favorable Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed54
3/28/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (118-21)55
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.