SB0438

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Department of Education - Nonprofit Youth Development Program - Established

Sponsored by:

Senator Ramirez

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Establishing the Nonprofit Youth Development Program in the State Department of Education to provide grants to qualifying nonprofit organizations whose mission and programs target at-risk youth using certain strategies; requiring the Governor to include a $1,000,000 appropriation to the Program beginning in fiscal year 2020 and each fiscal year thereafter; requiring the State Superintendent to review certain applications and award certain grants; requiring the State Superintendent to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Ramirez
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0682
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Capital Budgets
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Exemptions
Grants
Income Tax
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Education
(2-306)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 15, 2018 9:25 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/25/20181/25/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/20181/26/2018Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
3/5/20183/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 1, 2018 2:02 P.M.