SB0997

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements

Sponsored by:

Senator Peters

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $250,000 in proceeds from the sale of a perpetual conservation easement on real property in the State; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Peters, Middleton, and Miller
Additional Facts:Introduced in a prior session as: SB0254 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Conservation -see also- Soil Conservation
Easements
Exemptions
Income Tax
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-207)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 9, 2018 12:32 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate2/5/20182/5/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
2/7/20182/7/2018Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
3/15/20183/15/2018Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 14, 2018 8:31 P.M.