HB0508

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

General Provisions - State Song - Advisory Panel

Sponsored by:

Delegate Reznik

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations


Synopsis:Repealing the State song; establishing the State Song Advisory Panel; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Advisory Panel; requiring the Advisory Panel to review certain submissions and suggestions for a new State song and hold at least three public hearings; requiring the Panel to report its recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1, 2018; terminating a certain provision of the Act after June 30, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Reznik, Cullison, Ebersole, Korman, Moon, and M. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018, June 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Governor
Hearings
State Symbols
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(7-318)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 15, 2018 5:15 P.M.