Delegate Mary Ann Lisanti

2015 Regular Session

District 34A, Harford County

Total Bills: 36 (Primary Sponsor: 7, Co-sponsor: 23, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0830
    (SB0464)
Workers' Compensation Act - Frivolous Proceedings - Required FindingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
PrimaryWorkers' Compensation (K1)
HB0831
    (SB0878)
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Regional Fire and Rescue BoatIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0854Income Tax Credit - Donations to Community CollegesIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0880
    (SB0096)
Election Law - Early Voting Centers - ParkingIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimaryElections (G1)
HB0884 / CH0463Election Law - Counting of Properly Cast BallotsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryElections (G1)
HB0920State Highway Administration - Relocation of Water and Sewer Lines - Payment of CostsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB1280Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Ripken Stadium RepairsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0221
    (SB0073)
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0222
    (SB0303)
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in DeathIn the House - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)Judiciary
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0229
    (SB0604 / CH0043)
Human Relations - Employment Discrimination - Protection for InternsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorHuman Relations (D5)
HB0351Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0452 / CH0421
    (SB0497)
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public SchoolsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0466 / CH0053
    (SB0802 / CH0052)
Transportation - Dedication of Structures (Hero's Highway Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 53Environment and Transportation
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0595
    (SB0529)
Special Elections for United States Senate Vacancies ActIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
HB0647Joint Insurance Association - Private Insurers - NoticeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0749
    (SB0817)
Higher Education - Sexual Assault Policies - ReportingIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
HB0761Criminal Law - Cyberstalking - PenaltiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0786 / CH0103
    (SB0613)
Self-Service Storage Facilities - Enforcement of Lien - ProceduresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0838 / CH0483
    (SB0416 / CH0482)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility ServicesEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 483Health and Government Operations
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0878 / CH0110
    (SB0536)
Certified Public Accountants - Definitions - Attest and Practice Certified Public AccountancyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Economic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0919 / CH0288
    (SB0551)
Land Use - Plans - Development and AdoptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB0949
    (SB0471)
Task Force to Study the Provision of Health Care Coverage to Uninsured MarylandersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
HB1028 / CH0113
    (SB0203)
Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of CommissionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1051
    (SB0424)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1056 / CH0115
    (SB0610)
Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1061
    (SB0300)
Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A LicensesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorAlcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB1072
    (SB0784)
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on Engagement in Lawful Activities - ProhibitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1138Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1210Public Safety - Maryland Building Performance Standards - Adoption, Implementation, and Enforcement of ModificationsIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1231
    (SB0868 / CH0204)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network ServicesIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 9:45 a.m.Economic Matters
4/13/2015 - 9:45 a.m.
Co-SponsorUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0405
    (SB0374 / CH0165)
Maryland False Claims ActVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceBy Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0941 / CH0139
    (SB0773)
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology TransferApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0942 / CH0140
    (SB0772)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.