Delegate Michael E. Busch

2018 Regular Session

District 30A, Anne Arundel County

Total Bills: 19 (Primary Sponsor: 9, Co-sponsor: 10, By Request: 0)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0092
    (SB0145)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Samaritan HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0093
    (SB0146)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Maryland Hall for the Creative ArtsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0094
    (SB0147)
Creation of a State Debt – Anne Arundel County – Light House Bistro and Culinary Training CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0095
    (SB0142)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Historic Annapolis MuseumIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0096 / CH0036Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Living Organ DonorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0106 / CH0186
    (SB0475 / CH0187)
Emergency Vehicles - Organ Delivery VehiclesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 186Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPrimaryVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0360
    (SB0330)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Masonic Lodge No. 89In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0654
    (SB0264)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Annapolis Maritime Museum and ParkIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
PrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1804 / CH0590Health – Medical Research FundingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 590Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryOperating Budget (B1)
HB0001 / CH0004
    (SB0002 / CH0003)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
HB0155
    (SB0148)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence and Trafficking SheltersIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0308 / CH0021
    (SB0646 / CH0015)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0365 / CH0574
    (SB0184 / CH0575)
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - AlterationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 574Ways and Means
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0592
    (SB0327)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - The Bernie HouseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
Co-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0819 / CH0253
    (SB0741)
Public Safety – Handgun Permit Review Board – AppealsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB0888
    (SB0707 / CH0252)
Criminal Law – Firearm Crimes – Rapid Fire Trigger ActivatorVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
HB1662 / CH0237Business Regulation – Retail Pet StoresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1697
    (SB1122 / CH0357)
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional AmendmentIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedAppropriations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and TaxationCo-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1795 / CH0006Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 6Health and Government Operations
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceCo-SponsorInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.