Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr.

2018 Regular Session

District 27, Prince George's, Charles and Calvert Counties

Total Bills: 31 (Primary Sponsor: 5, Co-sponsor: 25, By Request: 1)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0045
    (HB0025)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Town OfficeIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationPrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0749
    (HB1085)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Farming 4 Hunger Community Agricultural FacilityIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationPrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0983Maryland Historical Society - FundingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB1015Gaming - Fantasy Competitions - Operators and Video Lottery FacilitiesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
PrimaryGaming (C7)
SB1106Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - North Beach Volunteer Fire DepartmentIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationPrimaryState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0001
    (HB0002)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission Reform ActIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceFinanceCo-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
SB0002 / CH0003
    (HB0001 / CH0004)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
JudiciaryCo-SponsorFamily Law (D4)
SB0138
    (HB0003)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCo-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB0139Higher Education - Heroin and Opioid Addiction and Prevention Policies - Exceptions and RevisionsIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsCo-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
SB0184
    (HB0365)
Income Tax - Personal Exemptions - AlterationIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and MeansCo-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0286State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessIn the House - First Reading Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsCo-SponsorState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0344
    (HB1526)
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)In the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Safety (E4)
SB0373
    (HB0547)
Education – Head Start Program – Annual Appropriation (The Ulysses Currie Act)In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0379
    (HB0430)
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding LevelsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0450State Designations – State Paleontology Collection and Research Center – Calvert Marine MuseumIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0477
    (HB0677)
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone NumbersIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0502
    (HB0871)
Higher Education - University System of Maryland - Quasi-Endowment FundsIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
SB0594
    (HB0532)
Elective Franchise - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling PlaceIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorElections (G1)
SB0621Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National OriginIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorReal Property (N1)
SB0687
    (HB0422)
State Vacancy Reform ActIn the Senate - First Reading Executive NominationsExecutive NominationsCo-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0810
    (HB1208)
Job Reinvestment Act of 2018In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0903
    (HB1143)
Southern Maryland – University System of Maryland Partnership Act of 2018In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
SB0904Public Schools – Social Media Use by EducatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0905
    (HB1251)
Creation of a State Debt - Calvert County - East-John Youth Center PoolsIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationCo-SponsorState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0911Veteran Suicide Prevention - Comprehensive Action PlanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0997Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation EasementsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB1083
    (HB0088)
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - RevisionsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Co-SponsorPublic Health (J1)
SB1138
    (HB1342)
Legislative Branch of State Government - Sexual HarassmentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCo-SponsorState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB1202Higher Education - Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship - EstablishmentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCo-SponsorHigher Education (F2)
SJ0011Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas DrillingIn the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsCo-SponsorEnvironment (M3)
SB1092
    (HB1415)
Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in EducationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - OtherPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

February 23, 2018 1:27 P.M.