2007 Special Session 1

SENATE BILL 6

EMERGENCY BILL File Code: Insurance - Health Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 6
Sponsored By:
The President (By Request - Administration)
Entitled:
Working Families and Small Business Health Coverage Act

Synopsis:

Establishing a Small Employer Health Benefit Plan Premium Subsidy Program; establishing the purposes, administration, eligibility and other requirements, and funding for the Program; requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission to adopt regulations to establish eligibility requirements and levels of subsidies; authorizing the Maryland Health Care Commission to alter subsidy amounts; requiring the amount of subsidies to be subject to State budget limitations; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Senate Action
10/29
First Reading Finance & Budget and Taxation
10/30
Hearing 11/1 at 1:00 p.m.
10/29
Re-assigned Finance
11/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
11/1
Favorable with Amendments
Committee Amendment Adopted
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-16)
Special Order later today (Senator Middleton)
Floor Committee Amendment (Finance) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Exum) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
11/3
Third Reading Passed (30-17)
11/7
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Senate Requests House Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Senators Middleton, Kelley, and Garagiola
11/9
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
11/14
Passed Enrolled
House Action
11/2
First Reading Health and Government Operations
11/14
Hearing 11/15 at 9:00 a.m.
11/17
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
11/11
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order 11/18 (Delegate Hammen) Adopted
11/13
Floor Amendment (Delegate Miller) Rejected (42-83)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Eckardt) Rejected (31-94)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Eckardt) Rejected (28-96)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Hammen) Adopted (132-0)
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (103-29)
House Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Delegates Hubbard, Hammen, and Weldon
11/14
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (105-27)
Action after passage in Senate and House
11/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 7

Sponsored by:

President, The
Administration

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Agents and Brokers
Appropriations
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Disclosure
Federal Government
Grants
Health -see also- Mental Health
Health Care Commission
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals -see also- Clinics; State Hospitals
Long Term Care -see also- Continuing Care; Nursing Homes
Managed Care Organizations -see also- Health Maint Orgs
Medical Assistance
Mental Health
Notices
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Prince George`s County
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Uncompensated Care
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Health - General
( 15-103 , 15-103 , 15-140 , 15-701 , 19-101 , 19-108 , 19-214 )
Insurance
( 15-12A-01 , 15-12A-05 , 15-12A-04 , 15-12A-03 , 15-12A-02 , 15-1201 , 15-1201 , 15-1204 , 15-1206 , 15-1207 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Attorney General Letter (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
Senate
Number: 207675/01     Offered on: November 8, 2007   at: 3:57 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 233722/01     Offered on: November 8, 2007   at: 10:03 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 423122/01     Offered on: November 8, 2007   at: 10:01 p.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 163023/01     Offered on: November 18, 2007   at: 7:00 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 173721/01     Offered on: November 18, 2007   at: 7:31 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 436688/01     Offered on: November 17, 2007   at: 8:37 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 563428/01     Offered on: November 18, 2007   at: 7:12 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Conference Committee Documents (Displayed in PDF Format):
Report Number: 663421/1     Offered on: November 19, 2007   at: 2:10 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Amendment Number: 203923/1     Offered on: November 19, 2007   at: 2:10 a.m.     Status: Incomplete
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
November 1, 2007: Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-16)
November 3, 2007: Third Reading Passed (30-17)
November 9, 2007: Third Reading Passed (30-14)
House
November 13, 2007: Floor Amendment (Miller) {163023/1 Rejected (42-83)
November 13, 2007: Floor Amendment (Eckardt) {563428/1 Rejected (31-94)
November 13, 2007: Floor Amendment (Eckardt) {173721/1 Rejected (28-96)
November 13, 2007: Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Hammen) Adopted (132-0)
November 13, 2007: Third Reading Passed (103-29)
November 14, 2007: Third Reading Passed (105-27)