2009 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 137

File Code: Real Property Prior Year Introduction As: HB 42/08 - ENV
Sponsored By:
Delegates McConkey, Weir, Boteler, Hucker, Holmes, Bobo, and Glenn
Entitled:
Home Financial Accountability Act of 2009

Synopsis:

Clarifying the availability of specified books and records kept by or on behalf of specified common ownership communities; requiring the governing bodies of specified common ownership communities, on request of a member, unit owner, or lot owner, to compile and send specified information within a specified time; altering limitations concerning public inspection of specified records; prohibiting specified common ownership communities from imposing specified fees; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/23
First Reading Environmental Matters
Hearing 2/5 at 1:00 p.m.
2/23
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
2/24
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2/26
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
4/10
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
2/27
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
3/18
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
4/11
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/8
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 659

Sponsored by:

Delegate Tony McConkey, District 33A
Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Delegate Joseph C. Boteler, III, District 8
Delegate Cheryl D. Glenn, District 45
Delegate Marvin E. Holmes, Jr., District 23B
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Michael H. Weir, Jr., District 6

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Condominiums
Cooperative Associations
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Homeowners Associations
Housing -see also- Apartments; Condominiums; Mobile Homes
Privacy
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Corporations and Associations
( 5-6B-18.5 )
Real Property
( 11-116 , 11B-112 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 240119/01     Offered on: February 24, 2009   at: 10:14 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 718174/01     Offered on: April 11, 2009   at: 1:35 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
February 26, 2009: Third Reading Passed (135-0)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Senate
April 8, 2009: Third Reading Passed (47-0)