2009 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 302

File Code: Family Law Crossfiled with: SENATE BILL 268
Sponsored By:
The Speaker (By Request - Administration) and Delegates Barnes, Bronrott, Doory, Dumais, Frick, Guzzone, Lee, Levi, Rosenberg, Vaughn, and Hecht
Entitled:
Family Law - Temporary Protective Orders - Surrender of Firearms

Synopsis:

Authorizing a judge in entering a temporary protective order to order the respondent to surrender to law enforcement authorities any firearm in the respondent's possession and to refrain from possessing any firearm for the duration of the order under specified circumstances; requiring a law enforcement officer to provide specified information to the respondent and to transport and store the firearm in a specified manner; making it a misdemeanor to fail to comply with an order to surrender firearms; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/29
First Reading Judiciary
1/30
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
3/9
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/10
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order 3/12 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
3/12
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (44-87)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frank) Rejected (46-86)
Floor Amendment (Delegate McConkey) Rejected (40-96)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Dwyer) Rejected (39-92)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/17
Third Reading Passed (92-45)
4/1
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/18
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
4/3
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/1
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/2
Third Reading Passed (31-15)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 491

Sponsored by:

Speaker, The
Administration
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate William A. Bronrott, District 16
Delegate Ann Marie Doory, District 43
Delegate Kathleen M. Dumais, District 15
Delegate C. William Frick, District 16
Delegate Guy Guzzone, District 13
Delegate Sue Hecht, District 3A
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Gerron S. Levi, District 23A
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41
Delegate Michael L. Vaughn, District 24

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties; Sentences; etc.
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Guns
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Penalties
Protection Orders
Storage
Weapons -see also- Guns

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Family Law
( 4-505 , 4-506.1 , 4-509 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 303823/02     Offered on: March 13, 2009   at: 3:41 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 343628/01     Offered on: March 13, 2009   at: 3:40 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 373324/01     Offered on: March 13, 2009   at: 3:39 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 622218/01     Offered on: March 10, 2009   at: 10:26 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 783021/01     Offered on: March 13, 2009   at: 3:39 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 12, 2009: Floor Amendment (ODonnell) {783021/1 Rejected (44-87)
March 12, 2009: Floor Amendment (Frank) {373324/1 Rejected (46-86)
March 12, 2009: Floor Amendment (McConkey) {343628/1 Rejected (40-96)
March 12, 2009: Floor Amendment (Dwyer) {303823/2 Rejected (39-92)
March 17, 2009: Third Reading Passed (92-45)
Senate
April 2, 2009: Third Reading Passed (31-15)