2009 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 1179

File Code: Elections
Sponsored By:
Delegates Cardin, Hixson, Olszewski, and Ross
Entitled:
Election Law - Early Voting

Synopsis:

Establishing a process to allow a voter in the State to vote in primary or general elections at early voting centers, instead of in the voter's assigned precinct on election day; requiring each county to have a specified number of early voting centers, based on the number of registered voters in the county; requiring the State Board of Elections, in collaboration with the local board of elections in a county, to designate the early voting polling centers in that county; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
2/13
First Reading Ways and Means
2/16
Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/24
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Frank) Rejected (46-85)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Boteler) Rejected (36-96)
Floor Amendment (Delegate George)
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate George) Rejected (38-95)
Floor Amendment (Delegate Eckardt) Rejected (36-97)
Motion Special Order 3/28 (Delegate Sossi)
Special Order later today (Delegate Sossi) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Shank) Rejected (38-94)
Special Order later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Sossi) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (39-90)
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/25
Third Reading Passed (100-36)
4/5
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
House Requests Senate Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Delegates Ross, Cardin, and Elmore
4/10
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/28
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/5
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (16-31)
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman)
Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Rejected (20-25)
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-2)
4/8
Senate Refuses to Recede
Conference Committee Appointed ...
Senators Dyson, Conway, and Colburn
4/10
Motion limit debate (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted (33-14)
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Third Reading Passed (30-16)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/7
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 445

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jon S. Cardin, District 11
Delegate Sheila E. Hixson, District 20
Delegate John A. Olszewski, Jr., District 6
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Ballots
Campaign Financing
Comptroller
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Elections -see also- Ballots; Camp Financ; Pol Cands; Voting
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Gifts
Income Tax
Judges
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Public Information
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees & Taxes; specific tax.
Rules and Regulations
Salaries -see also- Overtime; Reimbursement Rates
Voting -see also- Ballots; Elections

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Election Law
( 1-101 , 1-101 , 1-101 , 9-404 , 10-101 , 10-203 , 10-205 , 10-301.1 , 10-310 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 103826/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 5:45 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 123724/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 5:53 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 373829/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 9:18 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 443625/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 6:02 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 533323/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 6:18 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 775361/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 5:40 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 873825/01     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 9:22 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 883820/02     Offered on: March 27, 2009   at: 6:41 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Senate
Number: 284638/01     Offered on: April 8, 2009   at: 12:20 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 623522/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 11:42 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 743729/01     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 4:37 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 923126/02     Offered on: April 9, 2009   at: 11:37 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Conference Committee Documents (Displayed in PDF Format):
Report Number: 923329/1     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 10:30 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Amendment Number: 313620/2     Offered on: April 13, 2009   at: 10:49 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 24, 2009: Floor Amendment (Frank) {103826/1 Rejected (46-85)
March 24, 2009: Floor Amendment (Boteler) {123724/1 Rejected (36-96)
March 24, 2009: Floor Amendment (George) Rejected (38-95)
March 24, 2009: Floor Amendment (Eckardt) {533323/1 Rejected (36-97)
March 24, 2009: Floor Amendment (Shank) {883820/2 Rejected (38-94)
March 24, 2009: Floor Amendment (Kipke) {873825/1 Rejected (39-90)
March 25, 2009: Third Reading Passed (100-36)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Senate
April 5, 2009: Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {923126/2 Rejected (16-31)
April 5, 2009: Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {623522/1 Rejected (20-25)
April 5, 2009: Third Reading Passed (44-2)
April 10, 2009: Motion limit debate (Kasemeyer) Adopted (33-14)
April 10, 2009: Third Reading Passed (30-16)