2011 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 145

File Code: Public Health
Sponsored By:
Delegates Hubbard, Barnes, Bobo, Branch, Braveboy, Costa, Cullison, Frush, Gaines, Holmes, Hucker, A. Kelly, Lee, Mizeur, Murphy, Nathan-Pulliam, Niemann, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Rosenberg, Ross, Tarrant, V. Turner, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, Walker, Zucker, Donoghue, Kipke, Morhaim, Pendergrass, and Reznik
Entitled:
Environment - Cadmium in Children's Jewelry - Prohibition

Synopsis:

Prohibiting a person, on or after July 1, 2012, from manufacturing, selling, offering for sale, or distributing in the State any children's jewelry that contains cadmium at 0.0075% by weight; authorizing the Department of the Environment to adopt specified regulations; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
House Action
1/26
First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/2
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/22

Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/21
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/22
Third Reading Passed (134-2)
4/8
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Passed Enrolled
Senate Action
3/25
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/28
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/5
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 578

Sponsored by:

Delegate James W. Hubbard, District 23A
Delegate Ben Barnes, District 21
Delegate Elizabeth Bobo, District 12B
Delegate Talmadge Branch, District 45
Delegate Aisha N. Braveboy, District 25
Delegate Robert A. Costa, District 33B
Delegate Bonnie Cullison, District 19
Delegate John P. Donoghue, District 2C
Delegate Barbara Frush, District 21
Delegate Tawanna P. Gaines, District 22
Delegate Marvin E. Holmes, Jr., District 23B
Delegate Tom Hucker, District 20
Delegate Ariana B. Kelly, District 16
Delegate Nicholaus R. Kipke, District 31
Delegate Susan C. Lee, District 16
Delegate Heather R. Mizeur, District 20
Delegate Dan K. Morhaim, District 11
Delegate Peter Murphy, District 28
Delegate Shirley Nathan-Pulliam, District 10
Delegate Doyle L. Niemann, District 47
Delegate Nathaniel T. Oaks, District 41
Delegate Joseline A. Pena-Melnyk, District 21
Delegate Shane E. Pendergrass, District 13
Delegate Kirill Reznik, District 39
Delegate Samuel I. Rosenberg, District 41
Delegate Justin D. Ross, District 22
Delegate Shawn Z. Tarrant, District 40
Delegate Veronica Turner, District 26
Delegate Geraldine Valentino-Smith, District 23A
Delegate Jeff Waldstreicher, District 18
Delegate Jay Walker, District 26
Delegate Craig J. Zucker, District 14

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Environment, Department of
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Environment
( 6-1401 , 6-1402 , 6-1403 , 6-1404 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 826480/01     Offered on: March 23, 2011   at: 10:08 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Senate
Number: 814931/01     Offered on: April 8, 2011   at: 2:57 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
House
Health and Government Operations
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 22, 2011: Third Reading Passed (134-2)
April 8, 2011: Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Senate
April 5, 2011: Third Reading Passed (47-0)