2011 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 151

File Code: Public Health
Sponsored By:
Senators Frosh, Benson, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Klausmeier, Madaleno, Manno, Middleton, Montgomery, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Raskin, Rosapepe, Zirkin, Garagiola, Glassman, Mathias, and Muse
Entitled:
Public Health - Containers of Infant Formula Manufactured with Bisphenol-A - Prohibition

Synopsis:

Prohibiting the State from purchasing infant formula in containers containing a specified amount of bisphenol-A on or after July 1, 2014; prohibiting the manufacture, sale, or distribution of specified containers of infant formula containing a specified amount of bisphenol-A on or after July 1, 2014; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2012; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/24
First Reading Finance
1/26
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/25

Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/26
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/5
Returned Passed
House Action
3/27
First Reading Health and Government Operations
3/30
Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
4/3
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
4/4
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 189

Sponsored by:

Senator Brian E. Frosh, District 16
Senator Joanne C. Benson, District 24
Senator Rob Garagiola, District 15
Senator Lisa A. Gladden, District 41
Senator Barry Glassman, District 35
Senator Verna L. Jones-Rodwell, District 44
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18
Senator Roger P. Manno, District 19
Senator James N. Mathias, Jr., District 38
Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator Karen S. Montgomery, District 14
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Paul G. Pinsky, District 22
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40
Senator Jamie Raskin, District 20
Senator Jim Rosapepe, District 21
Senator Bobby A. Zirkin, District 11

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Beverage Containers
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc
Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn.
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Procurement
Reports
Rules and Regulations

Bill affects the following Statute:

Health - General
( 24-304 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 607070/02     Offered on: March 25, 2011   at: Noon     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Finance
House
Health and Government Operations
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 26, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
House
April 4, 2011: Third Reading Passed (138-0)