2011 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 281

CONSTITUTIONAL AMENDMENT File Code: Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Sponsored By:
Senators Miller, Currie, Muse, Peters, and Ramirez
Entitled:
Prince George's County - Orphans' Court Judges - Qualifications

Synopsis:

Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to prescribe different qualifications for judges of the Orphans' Court for Prince George's County; requiring judges of the Orphans' Court for Prince George's County to have been admitted to practice law in the State and be members in good standing of the Maryland Bar; and submitting this amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
1/31
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
2/2
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2/28

Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/1
Committee Amendment Adopted
Special Order until 3/2 (Senator Stone) Adopted
3/2
Favorable with Amendments
Special Order until 3/4 (Senator Stone) Adopted
3/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/8
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
4/6
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/9
First Reading Judiciary
3/16
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/6
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-29)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/10
Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to
constitutional referendum - Chapter 394

Sponsored by:

Senator Thomas V. Mike Miller, Jr., District 27
Senator Ulysses Currie, District 25
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Douglas J. J. Peters, District 23
Senator Victor R. Ramirez, District 47

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Attorneys
Baltimore County
Constitutional Amendments
Judges
Orphans' Court
Prince George's County
Referendum

Bill affects the following Statute:

Article - IV Judiciary Department
( 40 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 273022/01     Offered on: March 4, 2011   at: 12:05 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 468670/01     Offered on: March 1, 2011   at: 10:22 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 702717/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 1:30 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Judicial Proceedings
House
Judiciary
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 8, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
April 6, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
House
April 6, 2011: Third Reading Passed (105-29)