2011 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 644

File Code: State Government - General Assembly Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 766
Sponsored By:
Senators Ferguson and Madaleno
Entitled:
State Government - Transparency and Open Government

Synopsis:

Establishing the Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government; requiring the Committee to make recommendations on State transparency goals and policies, review laws, programs, services, and policies, and consult with specified State entities; requiring the Committee to submit an annual report to the General Assembly on or before a specified date; providing that a public body need not prepare written minutes of an open meeting if a live and archived video or audio streaming of the open session is available; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/4
First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2/16
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21
Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
3/22
Favorable Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed
3/24
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/7

Senate Concur - House Amendments
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/22
First Reading Health and Government Operations
3/30
Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m.
4/8
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
4/4
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/6
Floor Committee Amendment Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-2)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 508

Sponsored by:

Senator Bill Ferguson, District 46
Senator Richard S. Madaleno, Jr., District 18

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Disclosure
Electronic Government
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee.
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Public Information
Recordings -see also- Video
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports

Bill affects the following Statutes:

State Government
( 2-10A-14 , 10-509 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Amendments:
House
Number: 486884/01     Offered on: April 8, 2011   at: 12:16 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 686989/02     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 5:50 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
House
Health and Government Operations
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 24, 2011: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (46-0)
House
April 6, 2011: Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-2)