2011 Regular Session

SENATE BILL 690

File Code: Utility Regulation Crossfiled with: HOUSE BILL 1121
Sponsored By:
Senators Middleton, Astle, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Muse, and Pugh
Entitled:
Renewable Energy Portfolio - Waste-to-Energy and Refuse-Derived Fuel

Synopsis:

Expanding the definition of a Tier 1 renewable source to include waste-to-energy and refuse-derived fuel; altering the definition of a Tier 2 renewable source to exclude waste-to-energy; providing that a Tier 1 source using waste-to-energy or refuse-derived fuel is eligible for inclusion in meeting a specified standard only if the source is connected with the distribution grid serving Maryland; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

Legislative date is used to record history occurring in the Chambers otherwise Calendar date is used.
Senate Action
2/4
First Reading Finance
2/9
Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m.
3/11

Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/15
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
4/6
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Special Order until later today (Senator Frosh) Adopted
Special Order until later today (Senator Frosh) Adopted
4/7
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Motion Special Order until later today (Senator Frosh) Rejected (11-31)
Third Reading Passed (24-20)
Passed Enrolled
House Action
3/16
First Reading Economic Matters
4/9
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/5
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
4/6
Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) Rejected
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (74-60)
Action after passage in Senate and House
5/19
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 519

Sponsored by:

Senator Thomas M. Middleton, District 28
Senator John C. Astle, District 30
Senator Barry Glassman, District 35
Senator Delores G. Kelley, District 10
Senator Allan H. Kittleman, District 9
Senator Katherine Klausmeier, District 8
Senator James N. Mathias, Jr., District 38
Senator C. Anthony Muse, District 26
Senator Catherine E. Pugh, District 40

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Alternative Energy Sources
Energy Matters -see also- Alt Energy Res; Fuel; Power Plants
Fuel -see also- Coal
Recycling
Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling
Utilities -see also- High Voltage Lines; Telephones; Water

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Public Utilities
( 7-701 , 7-701 , 7-703 , 7-704 , 7-704 )

Documents

All documents except Roll Call Votes are displayed in PDF format:
Bill Text: First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note: Available
Attorney General Letter: Available
Amendments:
Senate
Number: 667170/01     Offered on: March 11, 2011   at: 11:29 a.m.     Status: Adopted
House
Number: 813424/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 6:21 p.m.     Status: Rejected
Number: 833899/01     Offered on: April 9, 2011   at: 1:23 p.m.     Status: Adopted
Committee Votes :
Senate
Finance
House
Economic Matters
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
Senate
March 15, 2011: Third Reading Passed (47-0)
April 7, 2011: Motion Special Order until later today (Frosh) Rejected (11-31)
April 7, 2011: Third Reading Passed (24-20)
House
April 6, 2011: Third Reading Passed (74-60)