2007 Regular Session

HOUSE BILL 10

File Code: Criminal Law - Procedure Prior Year Introduction As: HB 64/06 - JUD
Sponsored By:
Delegate Haynes
Entitled:
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Police Records - Arrest Without Charge - Automatic

Synopsis:

Providing that a person who is arrested or confined by a law enforcement unit after October 1, 2007, and is released without being charged is entitled to automatic expungement of all police records relating to the matter; requiring the expungement of specified police records if requirements are met; repealing provisions relative to a request for expungement of a specified police record that require written notice; repealing provisions prohibiting a person from giving a specified notice before a statute of limitations expires; etc.

History by Legislative and Calendar Date

House Action
10/30
Pre-filed
1/10
First Reading Judiciary
1/17
Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2/26
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2/27
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Special Order 2/28 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
2/28
Special Order 3/1 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
3/1
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
3/6
Third Reading Passed (130-9)
3/29
Returned Passed
Senate Action
3/7
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
3/21
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/30
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
3/28
Favorable
Special Order 4/2 (Senator Garagiola) Adopted
3/29
Favorable Report Adopted
Floor Amendment (Senator Jacobs) Withdrawn
Second Reading Passed
3/30
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Action after passage in House and Senate
4/10
Approved by the Governor
- Chapter 63

Bill indexed under the following Subjects:

Arrests
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Expungement
Fees -see also- Devt Fees and Taxes; Reimbursement Rates
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Notices
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Bill affects the following Statutes:

Criminal Procedure
( 10-101 , 10-102 , 10-102 , 10-103 , 10-103.1 )

Documents:

Bill Text (Displayed in PDF Format): First Reading, Third Reading, Enrolled, Chapter
Fiscal and Policy Note (Displayed in PDF Format): Available
Amendments (Displayed in PDF Format):
House
Number: 402311/01     Offered on: February 27, 2007   at: 10:25 a.m.     Status: Adopted
Number: 873726/02     Offered on: March 1, 2007   at: 10:09 a.m.     Status: Rejected
Senate
Number: 543127/01     Offered on: April 2, 2007   at: 3:57 p.m.     Status: Withdrawn
Roll Call Votes (Legislative dates are shown):
House
March 6, 2007: Third Reading Passed (130-9)
Senate
March 30, 2007: Third Reading Passed (47-0)